NJ A5640 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1551
Note: Carry Foward to future S2101
Note: Carry Over of previous S1326
Note: Carry Over of previous A2904
Note: Carry Foward to future S2101
Note: Carry Over of previous S1326
Note: Carry Over of previous A2904
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-12 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee
Pending: Assembly Regulated Professions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-12 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee
Pending: Assembly Regulated Professions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Concerning the "Contractors' Registration Act."
Title
Concerning the "Contractors' Registration Act."
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-12 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5640 (Carry Over) 2021-05-12 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee
A5640 (Carry Over) 2021-05-12 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee
S1544 (Same As) 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
S1326 (Carry Over) 2018-02-01 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A2904 (Carry Over) 2019-03-07 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
A5640 (Carry Over) 2021-05-12 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee
S1544 (Same As) 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
S1326 (Carry Over) 2018-02-01 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A2904 (Carry Over) 2019-03-07 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/A5640 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/A9999/5640_I1.HTM |