NJ A5835 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2823
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on January 16 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-01-16 - Approved P.L.2023, c.346.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on January 16 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-01-16 - Approved P.L.2023, c.346.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes regional authority to develop and operate regional rehabilitation and reentry center.
Title
Authorizes regional authority to develop and operate regional rehabilitation and reentry center.
Sponsors
Rep. Louis Greenwald [D] | Rep. Pamela Lampitt [D] | Sen. James Beach [D] | Sen. Shirley Turner [D] |
Rep. Reginald Atkins [D] | Rep. Gabriela Mosquera [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-01-08 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 23 N: 13 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-08 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S4134 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-12-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 12 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-12-11 - Assembly - Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-08 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S4134 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-12-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 12 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-12-11 - Assembly - Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-16 | Senate | Approved P.L.2023, c.346. |
2024-01-08 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (23-13) |
2024-01-08 | Senate | Substituted for S4134 (1R) |
2023-12-28 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2023-12-21 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (58-12-3) |
2023-12-11 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2023-12-11 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee |
2023-12-04 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5835 (Carry Over) 2024-01-16 - Approved P.L.2023, c.346.
S4134 (Same As) 2024-01-08 - Substituted by A5835 (1R)
S4134 (Same As) 2024-01-08 - Substituted by A5835 (1R)