NJ A6007 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-13 - Approved P.L.2019, c.350.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-13 - Approved P.L.2019, c.350.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires insurers and insurance groups to submit corporate governance annual disclosure to DOBI Commissioner.
Title
Requires insurers and insurance groups to submit corporate governance annual disclosure to DOBI Commissioner.
Sponsors
Sen. John McKeon [D] | Sen. Nellie Pou [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S4287 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-05 - Assembly - Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-05 - Assembly - Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Senate | Approved P.L.2019, c.350. |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (37-0) |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Substituted for S4287 |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2019-12-16 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (76-0-1) |
2019-12-05 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-11-25 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S4287 (Same As) 2020-01-09 - Substituted by A6007