NJ A631 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-2)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-12-03 - Substituted by S2145
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-12-03 - Substituted by S2145
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes hiring preference for veterans in non-civil service jurisdictions.
Title
Authorizes hiring preference for veterans in non-civil service jurisdictions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-11-16 - Assembly - Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-03 | Assembly | Substituted by S2145 |
2015-11-16 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-01-16 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2145 (Same As) 2016-01-11 - Approved P.L.2015, c.178.
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2014/A631 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2014/A1000/631_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=A631 |