NJ A707 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A3371
Note: Carry Over of previous S2571
Note: Carry Over of previous S2571
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Pending: Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Pending: Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires MVC to waive knowledge test requirement for certain military service members who apply for commercial driver license.
Title
Requires MVC to waive knowledge test requirement for certain military service members who apply for commercial driver license.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3371 (Carry Over) 2022-03-07 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
S2571 (Carry Over) 2022-05-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee
S2807 (Same As) 2024-02-22 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee
S2571 (Carry Over) 2022-05-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee
S2807 (Same As) 2024-02-22 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2024/A707 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2024/A1000/707_I1.HTM |