NJ A721 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A4666
Note: Carry Over of previous S1678
Note: Carry Over of previous S1678
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Pending: Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Pending: Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires annual General Fund appropriation to DMVA for purposes of base realignment and closure.
Title
Requires annual General Fund appropriation to DMVA for purposes of base realignment and closure.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4666 (Carry Over) 2022-09-29 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
S1678 (Carry Over) 2022-02-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
S2408 (Same As) 2024-01-29 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
S1678 (Carry Over) 2022-02-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
S2408 (Same As) 2024-01-29 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2024/A721 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2024/A1000/721_I1.HTM |