NJ A810 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A3066
Note: Carry Over of previous A4847
Note: Carry Over of previous A4847
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-24 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-24 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes award of reasonable costs and attorney fees to farmers prevailing in certain farm management disputes.
Title
Authorizes award of reasonable costs and attorney fees to farmers prevailing in certain farm management disputes.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Andrzejczak [D] | Rep. Eric Houghtaling [D] | Rep. Adam Taliaferro [D] | Rep. John DiMaio [R] |
Rep. R. Bruce Land [D] | Rep. Nancy Pinkin [D] | Rep. Harold Wirths [R] | Rep. Ronald Dancer [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-01-24 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-24 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A810 (Carry Over) 2019-01-24 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A4847 (Carry Over) 2017-06-29 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
S4048 (Same As) 2019-08-23 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
A4847 (Carry Over) 2017-06-29 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
S4048 (Same As) 2019-08-23 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee