NJ A827 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-24 - Reviewed by the Sales Tax Review Commission Recommend to not enact
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-24 - Reviewed by the Sales Tax Review Commission Recommend to not enact
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes sales and use tax rate reduction period from October 1, 2009 through December 31, 2009 for sales of certain goods and services greater than or equal to $10,000; sets reduction period tax rate at 3.5%.
Title
Establishes sales and use tax rate reduction period from October 1, 2009 through December 31, 2009 for sales of certain goods and services greater than or equal to $10,000; sets reduction period tax rate at 3.5%.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-24 | Reviewed by the Sales Tax Review Commission Recommend to not enact | |
2010-01-12 | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2010/A827 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2010/A1000/827_I1.HTM |