NJ A834 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A326
Note: Carry Foward to future S3679
Note: Carry Over of previous A4151
Note: Carry Foward to future S3679
Note: Carry Over of previous A4151
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-16 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-16 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides free admission to State parks, forests, and beaches for certain veterans and military personnel.
Title
Provides free admission to State parks, forests, and beaches for certain veterans and military personnel.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A834 (Carry Over) 2019-05-16 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
A834 (Carry Over) 2019-05-16 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
A4151 (Carry Over) 2017-06-05 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
S1613 (Same As) 2018-02-05 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
A834 (Carry Over) 2019-05-16 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
A4151 (Carry Over) 2017-06-05 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
S1613 (Same As) 2018-02-05 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2018/A834 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2018/A1000/834_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=A834 |