NJ A890 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1866
Note: Carry Foward to future S1015
Note: Carry Over of previous A3880
Note: Carry Over of previous S1106
Note: Carry Foward to future S1015
Note: Carry Over of previous A3880
Note: Carry Over of previous S1106
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs DOH to develop plan to phase out use of latex gloves in health care facilities and food establishments.
Title
Directs DOH to develop plan to phase out use of latex gloves in health care facilities and food establishments.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A890 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
A890 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
A3880 (Carry Over) 2018-05-07 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
S1854 (Same As) 2020-02-24 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
S1106 (Carry Over) 2019-02-07 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
A890 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
A3880 (Carry Over) 2018-05-07 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
S1854 (Same As) 2020-02-24 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
S1106 (Carry Over) 2019-02-07 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/A890 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/A1000/890_I1.HTM |