NJ A895 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A3869
Note: Carry Over of previous S2567
Note: Carry Over of previous S2567
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-22 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-22 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes provisions for use of applicant and student criminal history at institution of higher education and degree-granting proprietary institution.
Title
Establishes provisions for use of applicant and student criminal history at institution of higher education and degree-granting proprietary institution.
Sponsors
Rep. Verlina Reynolds-Jackson [D] | Rep. Linda Carter [D] | Rep. Benjie Wimberly [D] | Rep. Tennille McCoy [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-22 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-22 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2024-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3869 (Carry Over) 2022-05-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
S2567 (Carry Over) 2022-05-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee
S3621 (Same As) -
S2567 (Carry Over) 2022-05-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee
S3621 (Same As) -