NJ A928 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-20 - Substituted by S515
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-20 - Substituted by S515
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits physicians and veterinarians to earn continuing education credits by providing certain free medical or veterinary services.
Title
Permits physicians and veterinarians to earn continuing education credits by providing certain free medical or veterinary services.
Sponsors
Rep. Alberto Coutinho [D] | Sen. Patrick Diegnan [D] | Rep. Reed Gusciora [D] | Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] |
Sen. Gordon Johnson [D] | Rep. Sheila Oliver [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-20 | Substituted by S515 | |
2010-05-06 | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading | |
2010-01-12 | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S515 (Same As) 2010-11-30 - Approved P.L.2010, c.89.
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2010/A928 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2010/A1000/928_I1.HTM |