NJ A930 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A595
Note: Carry Foward to future S1759
Note: Carry Over of previous A697
Note: Carry Foward to future S1759
Note: Carry Over of previous A697
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-02 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-02 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits disclosure of personal information pertaining to certain health care workers who are victims of assault; establishes civil penalty for each violation.
Title
Prohibits disclosure of personal information pertaining to certain health care workers who are victims of assault; establishes civil penalty for each violation.
Sponsors
Rep. Shavonda Sumter [D] | Rep. Daniel Benson [D] | Sen. Angela Mcknight [D] | Rep. Reginald Atkins [D] |
Rep. Ellen Park [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-02 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2022-01-11 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A930 (Carry Over) 2022-06-02 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
A930 (Carry Over) 2022-06-02 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
A697 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
S2624 (Same As) 2023-12-18 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A930 (Carry Over) 2022-06-02 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
A697 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
S2624 (Same As) 2023-12-18 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee