NJ A953 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-30 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-30 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes institutions of higher education to grant college credit to high school students who complete the Jersey Boys State or Jersey Girls State program.
Title
Authorizes institutions of higher education to grant college credit to high school students who complete the Jersey Boys State or Jersey Girls State program.
Sponsors
Rep. Sheila Oliver [D] | Sen. Jon Bramnick [R] | Rep. Daniel Benson [D] | Rep. Gerald Green [D] |
Rep. Herbert Conaway [D] | Rep. Amy Handlin [R] | Rep. Gabriela Mosquera [D] | Rep. Pamela Lampitt [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-29 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-30 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee |
2013-04-29 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (76-0-0) |
2013-02-07 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2012-01-10 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2777 (Same As) 2013-05-30 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2012/A953 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2012/A1000/953_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=A953 |