NJ A955 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A303
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-10-02 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-10-02 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the "Mortgage Assistance Pilot Program."
Title
Establishes the "Mortgage Assistance Pilot Program."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-10-02 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - Assembly - Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - Assembly - Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-10-02 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-02-20 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2014-01-16 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A955 (Carry Over) 2014-10-02 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
S1508 (Same As) 2014-05-19 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S1508 (Same As) 2014-05-19 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2014/A955 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2014/A1000/955_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=A955 |