NJ ACR184 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-20 - Substituted by SCR144 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-20 - Substituted by SCR144 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the "Joint Legislative Task Force on Health Insurance Exchange Implementation."
Title
Establishes the "Joint Legislative Task Force on Health Insurance Exchange Implementation."
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-20 | Assembly | Substituted by SCR144 (1R) |
2013-03-21 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Benson) |
2013-03-07 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2013-02-26 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
SCR144 (Same As) 2013-05-21 - Filed with Secretary of State
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2012/ACR184 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2012/ACR/184_I1.HTM |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2012/ACR/184_R1.HTM |