NJ ACR66 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR20
Note: Carry Over of previous ACR200
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR67
Note: Carry Over of previous ACR200
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR67
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Homeland Security and State Preparedness Committee
Pending: Assembly Homeland Security and State Preparedness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Homeland Security and State Preparedness Committee
Pending: Assembly Homeland Security and State Preparedness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends Constitution to dedicate money credited to the "9-1-1 System and Emergency Response Trust Fund Account" to maintain 9-1-1 system and emergency response.
Title
Amends Constitution to dedicate money credited to the "9-1-1 System and Emergency Response Trust Fund Account" to maintain 9-1-1 system and emergency response.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Homeland Security and State Preparedness Committee |
Same As/Similar To
ACR66 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Homeland Security and State Preparedness Committee
ACR200 (Carry Over) 2018-10-22 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Homeland Security and State Preparedness Committee
SCR49 (Same As) 2020-01-30 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
SCR67 (Carry Over) 2018-02-01 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
ACR200 (Carry Over) 2018-10-22 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Homeland Security and State Preparedness Committee
SCR49 (Same As) 2020-01-30 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
SCR67 (Carry Over) 2018-02-01 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/ACR66 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/ACR/66_I1.HTM |