NJ AJR101 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous AJR146
Note: Carry Over of previous SJR59
Note: Carry Over of previous SJR59
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates the second Friday of December of each year as "Paraprofessional and School-Related Personnel (PSRPs) in Our Schools Day" in New Jersey to recognize the contributions of paraprofessionals and school-related personnel.
Title
Designates the second Friday of December of each year as "Paraprofessional and School-Related Personnel (PSRPs) in Our Schools Day" in New Jersey to recognize the contributions of paraprofessionals and school-related personnel.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-01 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
AJR146 (Carry Over) 2022-03-08 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
SJR59 (Carry Over) 2023-12-14 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
SJR76 (Same As) 2024-05-06 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
SJR59 (Carry Over) 2023-12-14 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
SJR76 (Same As) 2024-05-06 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2024/AJR101 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2024/AJR/101_I1.HTM |