NJ AJR112 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SJR61
Note: Carry Over of previous AJR56
Note: Carry Over of previous AJR56
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-27 - Substituted by SJR38 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-27 - Substituted by SJR38 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Designates September of each year as "Sickle Cell Awareness Month" in New Jersey.
Title
Designates September of each year as "Sickle Cell Awareness Month" in New Jersey.
Sponsors
Rep. Annette Quijano [D] | Sen. Britnee Timberlake [D] | Rep. Ralph Caputo [D] | Rep. Mila Jasey [D] |
Sen. Gordon Johnson [D] | Rep. Shanique Speight [D] | Rep. Nicholas Chiaravalloti [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-08-24 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-24 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-24 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-27 | Assembly | Substituted by SJR38 (1R) |
2020-08-24 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-02-20 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee |
Same As/Similar To
SJR38 (Same As) 2020-09-30 - Approved P.L.2020, JR-4.
SJR61 (Carry Over) 2018-03-05 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
AJR56 (Carry Over) 2018-02-01 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
SJR61 (Carry Over) 2018-03-05 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
AJR56 (Carry Over) 2018-02-01 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee