NJ AJR120 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous AJR234
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates first full week of May of each year as "Tardive Dyskinesia Awareness Week" in NJ.
Title
Designates first full week of May of each year as "Tardive Dyskinesia Awareness Week" in NJ.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-11 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
2024-03-18 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (77-0-0) |
2024-03-14 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2024-02-05 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee |
Same As/Similar To
AJR234 (Carry Over) 2023-11-30 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
SJR110 (Same As) 2024-05-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
SJR110 (Same As) 2024-05-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee