NJ AJR145 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future AJR34
Note: Carry Foward to future SJR76
Note: Carry Foward to future SJR76
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-01 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-01 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates May of each year as "Emotional and Behavioral Disorder Awareness Month."
Title
Designates May of each year as "Emotional and Behavioral Disorder Awareness Month."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Assembly - Assembly Human Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Assembly - Assembly Human Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-01 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
2017-03-23 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (74-0-0) |
2017-03-20 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2017-02-28 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
AJR145 (Carry Over) 2017-05-01 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
AJR145 (Carry Over) 2017-05-01 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
AJR145 (Carry Over) 2017-05-01 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2016/AJR145 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2016/AJR/145_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=AJR145 |