NJ AJR157 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on June 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-29 - Substituted by SJR105
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-29 - Substituted by SJR105
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates August 29, 2017 as Governor James Florio Day in New Jersey.
Title
Designates August 29, 2017 as Governor James Florio Day in New Jersey.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-29 | Assembly | Substituted by SJR105 |
2017-06-01 | Assembly | Introduced, 1st Reading without Reference, 2nd Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SJR105 (Same As) 2017-07-21 - Approved P.L.2017, JR-11.
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2016/AJR157 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2016/AJR/157_I1.HTM |