NJ AJR168 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future AJR64
Note: Carry Foward to future SJR34
Note: Carry Foward to future SJR34
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on July 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-12-18 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on July 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-12-18 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes Commission on Drunk and Impaired Driving.
Title
Establishes Commission on Drunk and Impaired Driving.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-12-18 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2017-12-14 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Judiciary Committee |
2017-07-13 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
AJR168 (Carry Over) 2017-12-18 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
AJR168 (Carry Over) 2017-12-18 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
SJR117 (Same As) 2017-11-30 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
AJR168 (Carry Over) 2017-12-18 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
SJR117 (Same As) 2017-11-30 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading