NJ AJR193 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future AJR159
Note: Carry Over of previous SJR137
Note: Carry Over of previous AJR215
Note: Carry Over of previous SJR137
Note: Carry Over of previous AJR215
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-11-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-11-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates June of each year as "Immigrant Heritage Month."
Title
Designates June of each year as "Immigrant Heritage Month."
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
Same As/Similar To
AJR193 (Carry Over) 2020-11-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
SJR34 (Same As) 2020-02-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
SJR137 (Carry Over) 2019-06-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
AJR215 (Carry Over) 2019-06-17 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee
SJR34 (Same As) 2020-02-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
SJR137 (Carry Over) 2019-06-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
AJR215 (Carry Over) 2019-06-17 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/AJR193 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/AJR/193_I1.HTM |