NJ AJR28 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future AJR65
Note: Carry Over of previous AJR24
Note: Carry Over of previous AJR24
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-24 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-24 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permanently designates last week in February as "Eating Disorders Awareness Week" in New Jersey.
Title
Permanently designates last week in February as "Eating Disorders Awareness Week" in New Jersey.
Sponsors
Rep. Thomas Giblin [D] | Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] | Sen. Britnee Timberlake [D] | Rep. Nancy Pinkin [D] |
Sen. John McKeon [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
2020-02-24 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (79-0-0) |
2020-01-27 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee |
Same As/Similar To
AJR28 (Carry Over) 2020-02-24 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
AJR24 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
SJR64 (Same As) 2020-03-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
AJR24 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
SJR64 (Same As) 2020-03-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee