NJ AJR29 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future AJR76
Note: Carry Foward to future SJR39
Note: Carry Over of previous AJR50
Note: Carry Foward to future SJR39
Note: Carry Over of previous AJR50
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-14 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-14 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates May of each year as "Youth Smoking Prevention and Awareness Month."
Title
Designates May of each year as "Youth Smoking Prevention and Awareness Month."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-11-14 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-14 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
2018-05-24 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (72-0-0) |
2018-05-17 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
AJR29 (Carry Over) 2019-11-14 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
AJR29 (Carry Over) 2019-11-14 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
AJR50 (Carry Over) 2016-04-18 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
SJR52 (Same As) 2019-11-14 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
AJR29 (Carry Over) 2019-11-14 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
AJR50 (Carry Over) 2016-04-18 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
SJR52 (Same As) 2019-11-14 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2018/AJR29 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2018/AJR/29_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=AJR29 |