NJ AJR53 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-21 - Substituted by SJR40
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-21 - Substituted by SJR40
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates November of each year as "Children's Product Safety Awareness Month."
Title
Designates November of each year as "Children's Product Safety Awareness Month."
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-21 | Assembly | Substituted by SJR40 |
2012-12-13 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2012-02-21 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
SJR40 (Same As) 2013-05-09 - Approved P.L.2013, JR-8.
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2012/AJR53 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2012/AJR/53_I1.HTM |