NJ AJR72 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous AJR30
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-3)
Status: Passed on July 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-21 - Approved P.L.2017, JR-15.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-3)
Status: Passed on July 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-21 - Approved P.L.2017, JR-15.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Designates September 17 through September 23 of each year as "Constitution Week."
Title
Designates September 17 through September 23 of each year as "Constitution Week."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For Sjr31 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For Sjr31 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-21 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2017, JR-15. |
2017-06-22 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (74-0-0) |
2016-11-14 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2016-11-14 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (36-0) |
2016-11-14 | Senate | Substituted for SJR31 (1R) |
2016-10-20 | Senate | Senate Amendment (35-0) (Bucco) |
2016-09-26 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2016-09-15 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (76-0-0) |
2016-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced, 1st Reading without Reference, 2nd Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SJR31 (Same As) 2016-11-14 - Substituted by AJR72 (1R)
AJR30 (Carry Over) 2014-01-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
AJR30 (Carry Over) 2014-01-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee