NJ AR142 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-22 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-22 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges Congress to pass legislation creating comprehensive pathway to United States citizenship.
Title
Urges Congress to pass legislation creating comprehensive pathway to United States citizenship.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-21 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 12 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-22 | Assembly | Filed with Secretary of State |
2013-03-21 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (57-12-6) |
2013-03-14 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2013-02-07 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Homeland Security and State Preparedness Committee |
Same As/Similar To
SR95 (Same As) 2013-03-18 - Filed with Secretary of State