NJ S100 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S1405
Note: Carry Foward to future A2220
Note: Carry Foward to future S607
Note: Carry Over of previous S550
Note: Carry Over of previous A3159
Note: Carry Foward to future A2220
Note: Carry Foward to future S607
Note: Carry Over of previous S550
Note: Carry Over of previous A3159
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
The "New Jersey Intern Protection Act"; provides legal protections and remedies for persons engaged in internships with employers.
Title
The "New Jersey Intern Protection Act"; provides legal protections and remedies for persons engaged in internships with employers.
Sponsors
Sen. Nia Gill [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S100 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee
S100 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee
S100 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee
S550 (Carry Over) 2019-06-17 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
A3563 (Same As) 2020-02-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
A3159 (Carry Over) 2018-02-08 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
S100 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee
S100 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee
S550 (Carry Over) 2019-06-17 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
A3563 (Same As) 2020-02-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
A3159 (Carry Over) 2018-02-08 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/S100 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/S0500/100_I1.HTM |