NJ S1000 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S665
Note: Carry Over of previous A3642
Note: Carry Over of previous A3642
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires MVC to place designation on motor vehicle's registration information indicating registrant is deaf.
Title
Requires MVC to place designation on motor vehicle's registration information indicating registrant is deaf.
Sponsors
Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] | Sen. Parker Space [R] | Sen. Nellie Pou [D] | Sen. Declan O'Scanlon [R] |
Sen. Patrick Diegnan [D] | Sen. Anthony M. Bucco [R] | Sen. Nilsa Cruz-Perez [D] | Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S665 (Carry Over) 2024-01-08 - Substituted by A3642 (1R)
A3642 (Carry Over) 2024-01-16 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
A4110 (Same As) 2024-04-04 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
A3642 (Carry Over) 2024-01-16 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
A4110 (Same As) 2024-04-04 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2024/S1000 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2024/S1000/1000_I1.HTM |