NJ S1083 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2693
Note: Carry Foward to future S1837
Note: Carry Over of previous A4427
Note: Carry Foward to future S1837
Note: Carry Over of previous A4427
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Vetoed on January 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on January 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes loan program and provides corporation business tax and gross income tax credits for establishment of new vineyards and wineries.
Title
Establishes loan program and provides corporation business tax and gross income tax credits for establishment of new vineyards and wineries.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A544 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-06 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A544 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-06 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-21 | Senate | Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (39-0) |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (73-2-2) |
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Substituted for A544 (1R) |
2020-01-06 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-06 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2018-05-07 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (37-0) |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Senate Amendment (33-0) (Van Drew) |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1083 (Carry Over) 2020-01-21 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
S1083 (Carry Over) 2020-01-21 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
A544 (Same As) 2020-01-13 - Substituted by S1083 (3R)
A4427 (Carry Over) 2017-06-15 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
S1083 (Carry Over) 2020-01-21 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
A544 (Same As) 2020-01-13 - Substituted by S1083 (3R)
A4427 (Carry Over) 2017-06-15 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee