NJ S1088 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A4555
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 8 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-13 - Substituted by A815 (ACS/1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-13 - Substituted by A815 (ACS/1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Concerns Code Blue alert plans to shelter at-risk individuals. *
Title
Concerns Code Blue alert plans to shelter at-risk individuals. *
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Van Drew [D] | Sen. Thomas Kean [R] | Sen. Ronald Rice [D] | Sen. Jennifer Beck [R] |
Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-01-30 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-13 | Senate | Substituted by A815 (ACS/1R) |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading |
2016-12-05 | Senate | Transferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A815 (Same As) 2017-05-11 - Approved P.L.2017, c.68.
A4555 (Carry Over) 2015-06-15 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Homeland Security and State Preparedness Committee
A4555 (Carry Over) 2015-06-15 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Homeland Security and State Preparedness Committee