NJ S1121 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-07 - Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-07 - Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Changes UI contribution rates for certain employers. *
Title
Changes UI contribution rates for certain employers. *
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-31 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-07 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2012-05-31 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (36-0) |
2012-05-17 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2012-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2012-01-30 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2012-01-23 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2222 (Same As) 2012-05-14 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading