NJ S1136 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S1168
Note: Carry Foward to future A3164
Note: Carry Over of previous A5510
Note: Carry Over of previous S3813
Note: Carry Foward to future A3164
Note: Carry Over of previous A5510
Note: Carry Over of previous S3813
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-30 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-30 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Expands "Law Against Discrimination" to apply to health programs and activities and to prohibit discrimination based on association with individuals in protected classes.
Title
Expands "Law Against Discrimination" to apply to health programs and activities and to prohibit discrimination based on association with individuals in protected classes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-30 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1136 (Carry Over) 2020-01-30 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
S1136 (Carry Over) 2020-01-30 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A2216 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
A5510 (Carry Over) 2019-06-13 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S3813 (Carry Over) 2020-01-09 - Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
S1136 (Carry Over) 2020-01-30 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A2216 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
A5510 (Carry Over) 2019-06-13 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S3813 (Carry Over) 2020-01-09 - Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/S1136 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/S1500/1136_I1.HTM |