NJ S1140 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S1000
Note: Carry Over of previous A1833
Note: Carry Over of previous A1833
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-25 - Substituted by A3548
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-25 - Substituted by A3548
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires health benefits coverage for adolescent depression screenings.
Title
Requires health benefits coverage for adolescent depression screenings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-25 | Senate | Substituted by A3548 |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1000 (Carry Over) 2019-06-17 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A3548 (Same As) 2021-04-30 - Approved P.L.2021, c.73.
A1833 (Carry Over) 2019-11-18 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A3548 (Same As) 2021-04-30 - Approved P.L.2021, c.73.
A1833 (Carry Over) 2019-11-18 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee