NJ S1141 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Enrolled on December 5 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-05 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (77-0-2)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on December 5 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-05 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (77-0-2)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Permits board of fire commissioners to amend fire district budget after adoption to insert special items of revenue.
Title
Permits board of fire commissioners to amend fire district budget after adoption to insert special items of revenue.
Sponsors
Rep. Nelson Albano [D] | Rep. Ronald Dancer [R] | Rep. Matthew Milam [D] | Sen. Donald Norcross [D] |
Sen. Jeff Van Drew [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-12-05 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-05 | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (77-0-2) | |
2011-12-05 | Substituted for A898 (1R) | |
2011-11-21 | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading | |
2010-06-28 | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Housing and Local Government Committee | |
2010-06-28 | Passed by the Senate (40-0) | |
2010-03-04 | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading | |
2010-02-04 | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A898 (Same As) 2011-12-05 - Substituted by S1141 (1R)