NJ S1145 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-29 - Substituted by A1102
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-29 - Substituted by A1102
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for licensure of dementia care homes by DOH.
Title
Provides for licensure of dementia care homes by DOH.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-23 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-08 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-08 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-29 | Senate | Substituted by A1102 |
2015-06-22 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2015-06-08 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2015-06-08 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1102 (Same As) 2015-11-09 - Approved P.L.2015, c.125.