NJ S1152 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S2780
Note: Carry Over of previous S2780
Note: Carry Over of previous S2780
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-10-20 - Substituted by A2519
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-10-20 - Substituted by A2519
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs Attorney General to develop plan to disseminate Amber and Silver Alert information through social media.
Title
Directs Attorney General to develop plan to disseminate Amber and Silver Alert information through social media.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-09-29 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-10-20 | Senate | Substituted by A2519 |
2016-09-29 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2780 (Carry Over) 2015-06-25 - Senate Amendment (33-0) (Barnes)
A2519 (Same As) 2016-12-05 - Approved P.L.2016, c.78.
S2780 (Carry Over) 2016-11-10 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee
A2519 (Same As) 2016-12-05 - Approved P.L.2016, c.78.
S2780 (Carry Over) 2016-11-10 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee