NJ S1172 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-07 - Substituted by A2142 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-07 - Substituted by A2142 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits minors under 14 years of age from using spay tanning in tanning facilities and prohibits minors under 17 years of age from using tanning beds.**
Title
Prohibits minors under 14 years of age from using spay tanning in tanning facilities and prohibits minors under 17 years of age from using tanning beds.**
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-10-25 - Senate - Senate Amend (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-10-25 - Senate - Senate Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-10-25 - Senate - Senate Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-07 | Senate | Substituted by A2142 (2R) |
2012-10-25 | Senate | Senate Amendment (26-0) (Weinberg) |
2012-06-18 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2012-01-23 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2142 (Same As) 2013-04-01 - Approved P.L.2013, c.39.