NJ S1172 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A4263
Note: Carry Over of previous S3823
Note: Carry Over of previous S3823
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for training programs for notaries public and increases application fees.
Title
Provides for training programs for notaries public and increases application fees.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-03 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1389 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
A4263 (Carry Over) 2018-06-27 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
S3823 (Carry Over) 2019-05-30 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
A4263 (Carry Over) 2018-06-27 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
S3823 (Carry Over) 2019-05-30 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/S1172 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/S1500/1172_I1.HTM |