NJ S1236 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S1731
Note: Carry Over of previous S2965
Note: Carry Over of previous A5207
Note: Carry Over of previous S2965
Note: Carry Over of previous A5207
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on July 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-30 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on July 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-30 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes New Jersey Higher Education Student Advisory Commission.
Title
Establishes New Jersey Higher Education Student Advisory Commission.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Enact Emergency Clause (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-23 - Senate - Senate Higher Eduction Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Enact Emergency Clause (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-23 - Senate - Senate Higher Eduction Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-30 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee |
2020-07-30 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (40-0) |
2020-07-30 | Senate | Emergency Resolution (40-0) (Kean) |
2020-07-30 | Senate | Senate Amendment (40-0) (Kean) |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1236 (Carry Over) 2020-07-30 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
S2965 (Carry Over) 2018-09-24 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee
A3187 (Same As) 2020-02-24 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
A5207 (Carry Over) 2019-03-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
S2965 (Carry Over) 2018-09-24 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee
A3187 (Same As) 2020-02-24 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
A5207 (Carry Over) 2019-03-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee