NJ S1246 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 18 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-18 - Approved P.L.2011, c.107.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 18 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-18 - Approved P.L.2011, c.107.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Creates exception to age requirement for power boat operation conducted during authorized race.
Title
Creates exception to age requirement for power boat operation conducted during authorized race.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-23 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-08-18 | Approved P.L.2011, c.107. | |
2011-06-23 | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (78-0-0) | |
2011-06-23 | Substituted for A3255 | |
2011-05-23 | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading | |
2010-06-10 | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Transportation, Public Works and Independent Authorities Committee | |
2010-06-10 | Passed by the Senate (38-0) | |
2010-03-18 | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading | |
2010-02-08 | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3255 (Same As) 2011-06-23 - Substituted by S1246