NJ S1246 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1011
Note: Carry Foward to future S2670
Note: Carry Over of previous S1664
Note: Carry Over of previous A2502
Note: Carry Foward to future S2670
Note: Carry Over of previous S1664
Note: Carry Over of previous A2502
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires emergency action plans for delivery of oxygen to patient residences during public health emergency.
Title
Requires emergency action plans for delivery of oxygen to patient residences during public health emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-03 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1246 (Carry Over) 2022-02-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
S1246 (Carry Over) 2022-02-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
S1664 (Carry Over) 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A2502 (Carry Over) 2020-02-03 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Homeland Security and State Preparedness Committee
A2184 (Same As) 2022-02-07 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Homeland Security and State Preparedness Committee
S1246 (Carry Over) 2022-02-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
S1664 (Carry Over) 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A2502 (Carry Over) 2020-02-03 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Homeland Security and State Preparedness Committee
A2184 (Same As) 2022-02-07 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Homeland Security and State Preparedness Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2022/S1246 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2022/S1500/1246_I1.HTM |