NJ S1258 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S333
Note: Carry Foward to future A2826
Note: Carry Over of previous S861
Note: Carry Over of previous A3388
Note: Carry Foward to future A2826
Note: Carry Over of previous S861
Note: Carry Over of previous A3388
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 29 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-02 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Agriculture Committee
Pending: Assembly Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 29 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-02 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Agriculture Committee
Pending: Assembly Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits persons convicted of criminal animal cruelty offenses from owning domestic companion animals and from working or volunteering at animal-related enterprises; establishes presumption against pretrial intervention for certain persons; designated as "Moose's Law."
Title
Prohibits persons convicted of criminal animal cruelty offenses from owning domestic companion animals and from working or volunteering at animal-related enterprises; establishes presumption against pretrial intervention for certain persons; designated as "Moose's Law."
Sponsors
Sen. Troy Singleton [D] | Sen. Christopher Bateman [R] | Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] | Sen. Dawn Addiego [D] |
Sen. Patrick Diegnan [D] | Sen. Declan O'Scanlon [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-04 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-04 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-02 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Agriculture Committee |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (37-0) |
2020-06-04 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1258 (Carry Over) 2020-07-02 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Agriculture Committee
S1258 (Carry Over) 2020-07-02 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Agriculture Committee
A2319 (Same As) 2020-02-03 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture Committee
S861 (Carry Over) 2020-01-09 - Senate Amendment (35-0) (Singleton)
A3388 (Carry Over) 2018-02-15 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
S1258 (Carry Over) 2020-07-02 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Agriculture Committee
A2319 (Same As) 2020-02-03 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture Committee
S861 (Carry Over) 2020-01-09 - Senate Amendment (35-0) (Singleton)
A3388 (Carry Over) 2018-02-15 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee