NJ S1276 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S1472
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 11 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-11 - Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 11 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-11 - Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes pilot program in DOE to recruit disadvantaged or minority men to teach in certain failing schools under alternate route program.
Title
Establishes pilot program in DOE to recruit disadvantaged or minority men to teach in certain failing schools under alternate route program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-01-11 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-13 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-13 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-11 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2016-01-11 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (39-0) |
2014-12-01 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1276 (Carry Over) 2016-01-11 - Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
A1853 (Same As) 2015-05-11 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
A1853 (Same As) 2015-05-11 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading