NJ S1279 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on August 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-08 - Approved P.L.2013, c.108.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on August 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-08 - Approved P.L.2013, c.108.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Upgrades penalty for unlawfully transferring a firearm to an underage person; permits transfer for instruction and training. *
Title
Upgrades penalty for unlawfully transferring a firearm to an underage person; permits transfer for instruction and training. *
Sponsors
Sen. Shirley Turner [D] | Sen. Donald Norcross [D] | Rep. Charles Mainor [D] | Sen. Troy Singleton [D] |
Sen. Gordon Johnson [D] | Rep. Marlene Caride [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For A4179 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For A4179 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-08 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2013, c.108. |
2013-06-20 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (73-0-2) |
2013-06-20 | Assembly | Substituted for A4179 (1R) |
2013-06-06 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2013-06-06 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (39-0) |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2012-01-30 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4179 (Same As) 2013-06-20 - Substituted by S1279 (1R)