NJ S1304 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-17)
Status: Passed on July 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-30 - Approved P.L.2012, c.25.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-17)
Status: Passed on July 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-30 - Approved P.L.2012, c.25.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits State and local public contracts with persons or entities engaging in certain investment activities in energy or finance sectors of Iran. *
Title
Prohibits State and local public contracts with persons or entities engaging in certain investment activities in energy or finance sectors of Iran. *
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-28 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-28 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For A2146 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-28 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For A2146 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-30 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2012, c.25. |
2012-06-28 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (79-0-0) |
2012-06-28 | Assembly | Substituted for A2146 (1R) |
2012-06-25 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2012-06-25 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (38-0) |
2012-06-21 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2012-06-04 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2012-06-04 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2012-01-30 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2146 (Same As) 2012-06-28 - Substituted by S1304 (1R)