NJ S1342 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on October 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-10-06 - Approved P.L.2010, c.80.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on October 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-10-06 - Approved P.L.2010, c.80.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Renames "New Jersey Trauma Center" at University Hospital as "Eric Munoz Trauma Center."
Title
Renames "New Jersey Trauma Center" at University Hospital as "Eric Munoz Trauma Center."
Sponsors
Sen. Jon Bramnick [R] | Rep. Alberto Coutinho [D] | Sen. Robert Gordon [D] | Sen. Thomas Kean [R] |
Rep. Annette Quijano [D] | Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] | Rep. Frederick Scalera [D] | Rep. Concetta Wagner [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-08-23 - Senate - Senate Amend (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-10-06 | Approved P.L.2010, c.80. | |
2010-08-23 | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (36-0) | |
2010-06-21 | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence | |
2010-06-21 | Passed by the Assembly (80-0-0) | |
2010-06-21 | Substituted for A2504 (1R) | |
2010-06-10 | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading | |
2010-06-10 | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee | |
2010-05-20 | Passed by the Senate (40-0) | |
2010-05-10 | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading | |
2010-02-08 | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2504 (Same As) 2010-06-21 - Substituted by S1342 (1R)