NJ S1349 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A1050
Note: Carry Over of previous S2037
Note: Carry Over of previous S2037
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
Pending: Senate Environment and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
Pending: Senate Environment and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revises equine animal activities law in accordance with recommendations of New Jersey Law Revision Commission to clarify responsibility and liability issues.
Title
Revises equine animal activities law in accordance with recommendations of New Jersey Law Revision Commission to clarify responsibility and liability issues.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-10 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1564 (Same As) 2021-01-27 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
A1050 (Carry Over) 2019-03-04 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
S2037 (Carry Over) 2018-05-31 - Transferred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
A1050 (Carry Over) 2019-03-04 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
S2037 (Carry Over) 2018-05-31 - Transferred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/S1349 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/S1500/1349_I1.HTM |